ROYAL OSTEOPOROSIS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1102712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.84m £4.37m £4.57m £4.45m £5.40m
Total expenditure £5.07m £4.85m £5.83m £5.13m £3.74m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £572.90k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.16m £4.15m £3.93m £4.22m £4.94m
Income - Other trading activities £83.63k £78.31k £93.48k £104.03k £343.83k
Income - Charitable activities £486.45k £40.19k £448.91k £84.34k £89.12k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £109.98k £95.41k £91.64k £48.53k £30.93k
Income - Other £0 £7.55k £9 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.26m £1.93m £2.12m £2.09m £2.69m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.01m £3.88m £4.74m £4.00m £3.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.06m £974.40k £1.10m £1.13m £676.00k
Expenditure - Governance £41.67k £0 £0 £9.59k £21.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £16.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0