ROYAL OSTEOPOROSIS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1102712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Rosemary Anne Leonard Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
FRANCES GRIGG Trustee 16 July 2015 None on record
Dr Nicola Frances Anne Peel Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
Professor Neil Gittoes Chair 16 July 2015 None on record
Professor Nicholas Castell William Harvey Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
Richard Darch Trustee 28 February 2019 None on record
Claire Elizabeth Hook Trustee 28 February 2019 None on record
Caroline Trewhitt Trustee 26 May 2016
ROYAL HOSPITAL CHELSEA APPEAL LIMITED Received: On time
Peter John Gotham Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
Tim Willett Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
Dr Lynne Wigens Trustee 01 March 2017
NURSING AND MIDWIFERY COUNCIL Received: On time