Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF STAFFORD KNOT TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1102475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 31 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required