Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF STAFFORD KNOT TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1102475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £14.63k £13.98k £12.77k £11.26k £3.79k
Total expenditure £11.45k £14.69k £15.60k £11.02k £3.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £250 N/A N/A N/A