Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST ALBANS, HARLOW

Charity number: 1102502
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 January 2020 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 25 September 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 September 2017 Not Required