Financial history PLYMOUTH VINEYARD

Charity number: 1102919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £98.19k £89.64k £90.62k £110.84k £94.74k
Total expenditure £102.12k £93.91k £90.55k £106.69k £91.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £600 £2.90k