Accounts and annual returns CHARLIE AND KATHLEEN DUNNERY CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity number: 1104342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 February 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required