Financial history CHARLIE AND KATHLEEN DUNNERY CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity number: 1104342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £21.60k £28.49k £33.80k £21.57k £5.96k
Total expenditure £31.35k £31.38k £37.25k £22.95k £13.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A