GLOBAL CHALLENGE

Charity number: 1104311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 November 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 November 2020 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 November 2020 741 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 November 2020 1106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1691 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1691 days