Financial history WORCESTER YMCA

Charity number: 1102766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £916.52k £799.59k £1.78m £1.28m £1.21m
Total expenditure £671.28k £615.21k £1.13m £1.33m £1.19m
Income from government contracts £154.06k £51.25k £18.99k £10.98k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £428.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.58k £0 £8.10k £42 £250.00k
Income - Other trading activities £42.66k £53.53k £970.19k £851.12k £784.16k
Income - Charitable activities £872.26k £746.03k £802.28k £428.68k £62.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28 £32 £31 £8 £31
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £116.33k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £671.28k £615.21k £843.40k £694.36k £354.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £282.49k £633.95k £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £6.45k £0 £0 £15.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £833.24k