ELECTROSENSITIVITY-UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To promote and protect the physical health of sufferers of electrosensitivity, also known as electrical hypersensitivity (EHS) in the United Kingdom through the provision of support, education and practical advice. 2. To advance the education of the general public in all areas relating to electrosensitivity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 April 2004: Standard registration
- ES-UK (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL BEVINGTON M A | Chair |
|
||||||
PHIL WATTS | Trustee | 12 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN STEIN CBE | Trustee | 04 October 2007 |
|
|||||
SARAH DACRE | Trustee | 04 October 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.68k | £16.80k | £105.94k | £10.97k | £336.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.26k | £19.29k | £16.44k | £13.72k | £15.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF ELECTROSENSITIVITY, ALSO KNOWN AS ELECTRICAL HYPERSENSITIVITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO ELECTROSENSITIVITY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 The Oast
Pullens Farm
LAMBERHURST ROAD
HORSMONDEN
KENT
- Phone:
- 08456439748
- Email:
- enquirers@es-uk.info
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window