THE ST JAMES THE LESS PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1103639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Tomlinson Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Margaret Le Messurier-Ritchie Chair 01 April 2014 None on record
Peter Gardner Trustee 04 April 2020 None on record
Dale Culliford Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Alexander John Bond Trustee 20 May 2019 None on record
RICHARD BINCH Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
Jane Mary Cocking Trustee 07 November 2020
EMERGENCY NUTRITION NETWORK
Paul Christopher Joseph Sharp Trustee 07 November 2020 None on record