Accounts and annual returns LLANFAIR SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1102667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 March 2021 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 January 2020 199 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required