Financial history ISLE OF WIGHT LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1102853
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £283.91k £256.84k £256.84k £261.44k £145.39k
Total expenditure £349.57k £261.44k £261.44k £256.84k £253.39k
Income from government contracts £203.00k £256.84k £256.84k N/A £100.00k
Income from government grants £80.00k N/A N/A £184.00k N/A