Accounts and annual returns THE MARY MAGDALEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1104353
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 March 2023 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 March 2023 57 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time