Financial history THE FRIENDS OF COTTISFORD CHURCH

Charity number: 1103061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.64k £2.77k £3.90k £2.89k £2.60k
Total expenditure £8.25k £5.18k £5.27k £2.57k £5.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A