Trustees THE FRIENDS OF COTTISFORD CHURCH

Charity number: 1103061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nesta Jane Birnage Chair 05 October 2019
None on record
Olivia Eleanor Sarah Lane-Nott Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Patricia Hilton Johnson Trustee 19 February 2021
None on record
David Cantor Trustee 14 December 2015
None on record
Meryl Daniell Trustee 20 June 2015
None on record
FRANCES JACKSON Trustee 21 August 2013
THE COTTISFORD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
INSTITUTE FOR FOOD, BRAIN AND BEHAVIOUR
Received: On time
BARBARA ROSALIND HALE Trustee
None on record
JOHN GREENWOOD Trustee
None on record