ST TERESA'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER FRIEND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorraine Greaves Trustee 16 October 2016 None on record
Elaine Prescott Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Victoria Jane Simpkin Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Emma Louise Stretton Chair 26 September 2017 None on record
Caroline Righton Trustee 16 October 2016 None on record
Gillian Buckley Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
Jill Cruickshanks Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
DR Naomi Summers Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
Adele Vieceli Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
DENISE SCARISBRICK Trustee 26 March 2014 None on record
Ian McGrath Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
LYNNE VALENTINE Trustee 15 May 2013 None on record