THE TRESANTON TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports worthy causes agreed by trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
People
4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE ORTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JERRY LAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHELLEY LAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SILKE MEIXNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.04k | £9.81m | £457.50k | £457.85k | £430.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.23k | £1.01m | £272.52k | £540.39k | £303.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £9.10m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £705.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.01m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | 27 June 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | 27 June 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES , AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FOUNDER MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Birch Hall
Church Road
WINDLESHAM
Surrey
GU20 6BN
- Phone:
- 01
- Email:
- info@tresantontrust.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window