Accounts and annual returns HELP COUNSELLING FOR 9 TO 25 YEAR OLDS (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED

Charity number: 1103888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required