Trustees HELP COUNSELLING FOR 9 TO 25 YEAR OLDS (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED

Charity number: 1103888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lesley Brentley Chair 24 March 2011
BROAD PLAIN HOUSE (HIGHBURY MISSION)
Received: On time
REDLAND PARK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
Received: On time
Nilufar Ahmed Dr Trustee 11 July 2020
None on record
NAZEIA RANI Trustee 27 January 2019
None on record
CAROLINE BEALE Trustee 09 February 2018
None on record
DR AMANDA COOK Trustee 03 October 2017
None on record