CAVALIER KING CHARLES SPANIEL RESCUE & WELFARE

Charity number: 1104112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016
Annual return 31 December 2015
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015