CAVALIER KING CHARLES SPANIEL RESCUE & WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cavalier King Charles welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 June 2004: Standard registration
- CAVALIER RESCUE & WELFARE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SEDGBEER | Chair | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Skinner | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Roberts | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUE MANGHAM | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hilda Brewer | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA SEDGBEER | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.26k | £165.23k | £62.52k | £18.24k | £33.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.82k | £78.95k | £38.35k | £141.50k | £27.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 MAY 2004 as amended on 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF UNWANTED, ABANDONED, NEGLECTED AND MISTREATED CAVALIERS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RESCUE AND PROVISION OF CARE FOR SUCH ANIMALS AND WHERE APPROPRIATE TO FIND A SUITABLE ALTERNATIVE HOME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lockhamgate Cottage
Lockhamgate
Wrangle
Boston
PE22 9DD
- Phone:
- 01205872066
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window