Accounts and annual returns THE ROCK OF AGES CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY TRUST

Charity number: 1103506
Charity reporting is overdue by 137 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 August 2020 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required