Financial history THE ROCK OF AGES CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY TRUST

Charity number: 1103506
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.84k £8.80k £6.00k £8.95k £7.40k
Total expenditure £9.62k £8.00k £6.00k £7.95k £5.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A