VIKING CENTRE & YOUTH CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1102969
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £39.00k £37.30k £52.18k £23.52k £18.45k
Total expenditure £134.31k £36.60k £36.78k £40.35k £18.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £23.53k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.45k £0 N/A N/A £1.64k