Financial history THE CLIMATE CHANGE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1102909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £5.96m £8.07m £11.35m £10.53m £11.24m
Total expenditure £5.39m £6.84m £9.57m £10.16m £11.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £133.17k N/A £221.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.21m £1.06m £8.46m £7.30m £6.56m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.75m £7.01m £2.89m £3.23m £4.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.74m £6.01m £8.66m £9.15m £10.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £642.72k £831.10k £915.83k £1.02m £1.26m
Expenditure - Governance £60.83k £0 £70.27k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £392.09k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0