Trustees THE CLIMATE CHANGE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1102909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Hall-Smith Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
Joanne Marie Parker Trustee 16 January 2023
None on record
Mayumi Omi Trustee 10 May 2021
TRANSITIONZERO
Received: On time
Jeffrey B Gracer Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
Rt Hon Amber Augusta Rudd Trustee 01 February 2020
THE ROYAL UNITED SERVICES INSTITUTE FOR DEFENCE AND SECURITY STUDIES
Received: On time
Andrew Peter Clark Trustee 25 February 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CANFORD CLIFFS AND SANDBANKS, POOLE
Received: On time
Victoria Charlotte Le Huray Keilthy Trustee 10 July 2017
BLACKBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Mike Rann Trustee 10 July 2017
None on record
Zoe Jane Ashcroft Trustee
SPONSORS FOR EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITY LIMITED
Received: On time
BRITISH AMERICAN DRAMA ACADEMY
Received: On time