ST KITTS-NEVIS ASSOCIATION (SLOUGH)

Charity number: 1104873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £12.17k £11.90k £29.75k £14.45k £17.03k
Total expenditure £19.13k £7.35k £29.03k £14.86k £19.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £1.50k