Accounts and annual returns OLD PRIORY JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1103059
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 July 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 September 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required