NORTH EAST LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1105937
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £33.48k £33.67k £74.02k £65.95k
Other income £268.84k £249.36k £291.03k £231.34k £452.23k
Total expenditure £222.07k £265.68k £286.08k £355.47k £502.81k