NORTH EAST LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1105937
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Dunn Trustee 21 November 2019 None on record
JEREMY CRIPPS Trustee 04 August 2016
SEVEN STORIES, THE NATIONAL CENTRE FOR CHILDREN'S BOOKS
Peter Jones Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
Sarah Ellen Farish Trustee 16 January 2020 None on record
Kimberley Jane Proud Trustee 16 January 2020 None on record
David Slater Trustee 23 January 2014
TYNESIDE AND NORTHUMBERLAND MIND Charity reporting is up to date
ANDREW WAKE Trustee 21 November 2019 None on record
KAREN SEMIANCZUK Trustee 21 May 2015 None on record