Accounts and annual returns BETA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1103023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window