Financial history BETA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1103023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £917.02k £996.79k £1.19m £973.79k £1.41m
Total expenditure £899.58k £1.24m £1.26m £1.01m £1.29m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £908.66k £992.46k £1.18m £465.07k £3.53m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £498.30k £340.36k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.47m
Income - Investment £8.36k £4.33k £9.09k £10.42k £11.79k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £263.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £894.70k £1.24m £1.25m £996.41k £1.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £2.12k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £894.70k £0 £1.25m £994.91k £1.24m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £4.88k £284 £0 £11.25k £42.52k