SONDA WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting & encouraging healthy living among the BAME,through physical exercise for older people who are at a risk of social exclusion;the youth to promote community cohesion.Helping people regain their confidence & self-esteem through counseling,training & mentoring.Providing advice to refugee & migrants.Working to try and get the youth out off the streets and encourage them get back to education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 April 2004: Standard registration
- SSC (Working name)
- SWAHILI SPEAKING COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN SONGA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bertha Andre | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM OTICHA | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
FRANCISCA WEYA | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Ogwela | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Opiyo | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.81k | £9.89k | £9.94k | £8.50k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.79k | £9.86k | £9.91k | £8.48k | £9.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 23/02/2013
Charitable objects
(I) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT (II) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY (III) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES (IV) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Area of benefit
EUROPE AND AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
12
ALMANZA PLACE
BARKING
ESSEX
IG11 0RT
- Phone:
- 07808204699
- Email:
- sondaworldwide@live.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window