KHM Portsmouth Volunteer Harbour Patrol

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote safety on the waters of the Eastern Solent, with particular emphasis on guidance and assistance to the leisure users of the Dockyard Port of Portsmouth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £16,843 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 30 September 2004: Standard registration
- QHM PORTSMOUTH VOLUNTEER HARBOUR PATROL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive O'Neill | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ben James McInnes | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Beel | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Dunton | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.49k | £16.43k | £20.30k | £17.08k | £20.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.58k | £17.81k | £15.62k | £18.16k | £18.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.00k | £16.43k | £17.25k | £13.62k | £16.84k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 January 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 2004. as amended on 21 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SAFETY ON INLAND WATERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE DOCYARD PORT OF PORTSMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
KHM Volunteer Harbour Patrol
Semaphore Tower
HM Naval Base
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 3LT
- Phone:
- 07810480150
- Email:
- coo@khmvhp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window