CONWY FURNITURE RECLAIM LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through the medium of recycling CFR provides household appliances and furniture for households on low income, support to the long term unemployed and provision of education/training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 14 June 2004: Standard registration
- 28 July 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £455.11k | £378.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £502.04k | £457.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 04 November 2008 | 278 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 29 November 2007 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 27 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (B) TO ASSIST THE LONG TERM UNEMPLOYED AND OTHERS IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE WHERE BENEFICIARIES CAN TRAIN WITH A VIEW TO INCREASING SKILLS LEVELS AND EMPLOYABILITY (B) PROVIDING ENVIRONMENTAL BENEFIT THROUGH THE RE-USE OF GOODS THAT MIGHT OTHERWISE BE DISCARDED BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCES, FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ACCESSORIES TO PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM HARDSHIP AND NEED, UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR NEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CONWY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window