ST PETER'S PRIMARY SCHOOL, EDGMOND PTA

Charity number: 1102984
Charity reporting is overdue by 881 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 150 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 150 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 515 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 515 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 881 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 881 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required