THE W.H. AUDEN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society maintains a website, publishes a newsletter twice a year, and supports occasional events such as lectures and readings. It endeavours to sustain communication among those interested in the work of W.H.Auden. Contributions to the Newsletter should be directed to the Editor c/o the Society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF NICHOLAS JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR EDWARD MENDELSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KATHERINE BUCKNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140 | £54 | £90 | £1.64k | £360 | |
|
Total expenditure | £295 | £45 | £1.57k | £482 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CONTEMPORARY ENGLISH LITERATURE THROUGH PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF THE LIFE AND WORK OF W.H. AUDEN (1907-1973) AND HIS LITERARY CONTEMPORARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 CLARENDON ROAD
LONDON
W11 2HW
- Phone:
- 02077271020
- Email:
- newsletter@audensociety.org
- Website:
-
audensociety.org/membership.html
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window