BRIDGETOWN ALIVE

Charity number: 1103636
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £1.45k £1.86k £5.73k £842 £4.96k
Total expenditure £569 £3.25k £58 £6.32k £1.25k