HACKNEY ASSOCIATION YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1103640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.73k £9.90k £12.99k £14.37k £14.37k
Total expenditure £9.62k £9.80k £12.79k £14.10k £14.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A