THE FORMER CHURCH OF IWERNE STEEPLETON ST MARY PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1103391
Charity reporting is overdue by 1375 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 279 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 279 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 644 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 644 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1010 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1010 days
Annual return 30 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1375 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1375 days
Annual return 30 April 2016 26 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required