THE FORMER CHURCH OF IWERNE STEEPLETON ST MARY PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1103391
Charity reporting is overdue by 1368 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2012 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £626 £1.30k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £442 £391
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A