REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD COVENANT RESTORATION ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1103425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £142.35k £202.47k £183.53k £167.75k £160.95k
Total expenditure £84.71k £115.27k £108.64k £126.66k £164.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A