Financial history LAUREUS SPORT FOR GOOD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1111364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.17m £5.67m £5.33m £6.01m £5.57m
Total expenditure £4.95m £5.21m £5.39m £5.78m £4.90m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £75.00k
Income from government grants £0 N/A £293.64k £138.58k £75.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.17m £5.67m £5.33m £6.01m £5.57m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.56m £4.22m £4.29m £4.79m £4.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £341.63k £985.68k £1.10m £942.70k £752.43k
Expenditure - Governance £44.18k £36.27k £28.21k £0 £45.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.60m £0 £3.10m £0 £3.30m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £44.18k £0 £0 £47.50k £0