Accounts and annual returns WOMEN'S INTERFAITH NETWORK

Charity number: 1103676
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 February 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 February 2022 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 February 2021 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window