THE SCIENCEBOOK TRUST

Charity number: 1103501
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1771 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1771 days
Annual return 31 August 2014 23 November 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2013 09 March 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2012 13 May 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 29 May 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required