THE SCIENCEBOOK TRUST

Charity number: 1103501
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £26.15k £854 £6.11k £1.07k £0
Total expenditure £49.51k £26.71k £28.71k £3.09k £72
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A