PORTHALLOW VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118168
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SAM HALL-DIGWEED Chair 01 February 2016 None on record
MR ANTHONY SKEWES Trustee None on record
Louise Richards Trustee 20 March 2017 None on record
JOHN JANE Trustee 03 May 2018 None on record
JACCI JOURDAN Trustee 26 November 2013 None on record
ALICIA JANE STRICKLAND Trustee None on record
Jane Webb Trustee 27 March 2018 None on record
Anne Saunders Trustee 27 March 2018 None on record
JANET WARFIELD Trustee 14 March 2012 None on record
Kity Clayson Trustee 27 March 2018 None on record
BRUCE BLOGG Trustee None on record
DAPHNE BLOGG Trustee None on record