Accounts and annual returns THE GALANTHUS TRUST

Charity number: 1103538
Charity reporting is overdue by 238 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 21 January 2021 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 20 January 2021 719 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required